Reports for Chamois Sport Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Chamois Sport Sàrl
- Chamois Sport Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Les Crosets and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Trading with recreational products».
- The company was founded on 18.01.2011 and has one person in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 25.09.2019. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- Chamois Sport Sàrl is registered in the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-401.669.159.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.01.2011
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Val-d'Illiez
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.4.008.226-4
UID/VAT
CHE-401.669.159
Sector
Trading with recreational products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Achat et vente de matériel de sport, ainsi qu'exploitation d'un magasin de matériel de sport (cf statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Chamois Sport Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004723930, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Chamois Sport Sàrl, à Val-d'Illiez, CHE-401.669.159, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 175 du 11.09.2019, Publ. 1004714285).
Nouvelle adresse:
Route des Crosets 69, 1873 Les Crosets.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Lang, Jean-Pierre, de Aristau, à Champéry, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé-gérant et président, avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: HR02-1004714285, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Chamois Sport Sàrl, à Val-d'Illiez, CHE-401.669.159, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 16 du 24.01.2011, p.21, Publ. 5999078).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Laurent, Jean-Michel, de Fey, à Val-d'Illiez, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Lang, Jean-Pierre, de Aristau, à Champéry, associé-gérant et président, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: à Val-d'Illiez, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00].
Publication number: 5999078, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Chamois Sport Sàrl, à Val-d'Illiez, CH-621.4.008.226-4, Le Sportif, 1873 Les Crosets, société à responsabilité limitée (nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
24.12.2010.
But:
achat et vente de matériel de sport, ainsi qu'exploitation d'un magasin de matériel de sport (cf statuts pour but complet).
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.00.
Faits qualifiés:
Contrat d'apports en nature et reprise de biens: selon contrat du 24.12.2010 et bilan au 30.06.2010, sont apportés à la société des actifs (CHF 310'738.92) et des passifs (CHF 1'702.99) de la société en nom collectif ' Chamois Sport, Laurent & Lang', à Val-d'Illiez (CH- 621.2.006.721-9), soit un actif net de CHF 309'035.93. Apport accepté pour ce prix en échange duquel sont remises aux apporteurs les 200 parts constituant le capital, le solde de 289'035.93 étant inscrit au passif du bilan en leur faveur, réparti pour CHF 204'111.77 en faveur de Jean-Pierre Lang et pour CHF 84'924.16 en faveur de Jean-Michel Laurent.
Obligations de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courriel. Selon déclaration du 24.12.2010, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Lang, Jean-Pierre, de Aristau, à Val-d'Illiez, associé-gérant et président, avec signature individuelle, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00;
Laurent, Jean-Michel, de Fey, à Val-d'Illiez, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.