Reports for Casa per anziani Blenio in liquidazione
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Casa per anziani Blenio in liquidazione
- Casa per anziani Blenio in liquidazione with its legal headquarters in Corzoneso is an Association from the sector «Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities». Casa per anziani Blenio in liquidazione is in liquidation.
- The management of the organization Casa per anziani Blenio in liquidazione consists of 5 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 03.07.2020. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-101.283.427.
Management (5)
newest members of the committee
newest authorized signatories
Liquidator
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1910
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Acquarossa
Commercial Registry Office
TI
Commercial register number
CH-503.6.000.046-5
UID/VAT
CHE-101.283.427
Sector
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Purpose (Original language)
La gestione e l'amministrazione di una casa per persone anziane ed altre affini, ai sensi della legge concernente il promovimento, il coordinamento e il sussidiamento dell'attività a favore delle persone anziane. Della Casa beneficeranno prioritariamente i cittadini residenti nella Valle di Blenio o attinenti.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Casa per anziani Blenio
- Ospedale Bleniese di Sa. Maria Ausiliatrice
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Casa per anziani Blenio in liquidazione
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004928552, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Casa per anziani Blenio in liquidazione, in Acquarossa, CHE-101.283.427, associazione (Nr. FUSC 68 del 10.04.2013, p.0, Pubbl. 7141018).
Trasferimento di patrimonio:
secondo contratto del 24.06.2020, l'associazione ha trasferito attivi per CHF 10'751'376.95 e passivi verso terzi per CHF 5'531'994.05 alla Fondazione la Quercia, in Acquarossa (CHE-353.221.535).
Controprestazione:
nessuna. [Rettifica dell'iscrizione no. 9 del 16.02.2000, pubblicata sul FUSC no. 42 del 29.02.2000].
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Greco, Giancarlo, detto Don Angelico, cittadino italiano, in Dongio (Acquarossa), membro, senza diritto di firma [finora: Greco, Angelico].
Publication number: 7141018, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Complemento all'iscrizione del registro giornaliero no. 9'101 del 16.07.2012, pubblicato sul FUSC no. 139 del 19.07.2012. Casa per anziani Blenio in liquidazione, in Acquarossa, CH-503.6.000.046-5, associazione (FUSC no. 139 del 19.07.2012, Pubbl. 6776682).
Statuti modificati:
27.08.2009.
Publication number: 6776682, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Casa per anziani Blenio, in Acquarossa, CH-503.6.000.046-5, associazione (FUSC no. 74 del 19.04.2004, p. 14, Pubbl. 2221190).
Nuovo nome:
Casa per anziani Blenio in liquidazione. L'associazione è sciolta con decisione dell'assemblea dei soci del 27.08.2009.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Bruni, Giovanna, da Blenio, in Olivone (Blenio), liquidatrice, con firma collettiva a due [finora: in Olivone, segretaria del consiglio con firma collettiva a due];
Gianella, Giuseppe, da Acquarossa, in Lottigna (Acquarossa), liquidatore, con firma collettiva a due [finora: in Lottigna, presidente del consiglio con firma collettiva a due con il segretario];
Peduzzi, Giuliano, da Biasca, in Torre (Blenio), vice-presidente, senza diritto di firma [finora: in Torre, vice-presidente del consiglio con firma collettiva a due con il segretario].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.