Reports for Caritas Zentralschweiz
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Caritas Zentralschweiz
- Caritas Zentralschweiz from Luzern operates in the sector «Other social services» and is active.
- The management of the organization Caritas Zentralschweiz, which was founded on the 24.04.1997, consists of 12 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 12.07.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Caritas Zentralschweiz is the following: CHE-105.985.296.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Stiftung Caritas-Hus, Tamilmandram Luzern.
Management (12)
newest members of the committee
Jolanda Achermann Sen,
Crisanto Farese,
Patricia Steiner,
Brigitta Emma Glur-Schüpfer,
Jürgen Stremlow
newest authorized signatories
Jolanda Achermann Sen,
Christian Vogt,
Franziska Pilar Kramer,
Daniel Thomas Furrer,
Thomas Johann Bornhauser
Executive board
Christian Vogt,
Franziska Pilar Kramer,
Daniel Thomas Furrer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.04.1997
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.6.019.858-1
UID/VAT
CHE-105.985.296
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Nimmt soziale Nöte wahr; Unterstützung von Menschen fachgerecht in schwierigen Lebenssituationen unabhängig von Alter, Herkunft, Geschlecht und Religion; Übernimmt im Rahmen seiner Zweckbestimmung soziale Dienste und andere Aufgaben im öffentlichen Auftrag; Sensibilisierung der Öffentlichkeit für Notlagen und engagiert sich für Gerechtigkeit und menschenwürdige Lebensverhältnisse; Einsetzung für gerechtere soziale und gesellschaftliche Strukturen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Luzern | 11.12.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Caritas Luzern
- Caritas Kanton Luzern
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Caritas Zentralschweiz
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006082796, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Caritas Luzern, in Luzern, CHE-105.985.296, Verein (SHAB Nr. 158 vom 17.08.2023, Publ. 1005818310).
Statutenänderung:
05.06.2024.
Name neu:
Caritas Zentralschweiz. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schärli-Gerig, Yvonne, von Ebikon, in Ebikon, Präsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Achermann Sen, Jolanda, von Sursee, in Sursee, Präsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.