Reports for Bulloni Pierre-André
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Bulloni Pierre-André
- Bulloni Pierre-André with its legal headquarters in Avenches is a Sole proprietorship from the sector «Trading with various goods». Bulloni Pierre-André is active.
- The company was founded on 21.03.1972 and has one person in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 13.12.2018. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- Bulloni Pierre-André is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-101.665.697.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.03.1972
Legal form
Sole proprietorship
Legal headquarters of the company
Avenches
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.052.567-5
UID/VAT
CHE-101.665.697
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Alimentation gén.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Bulloni Pietro
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Bulloni Pierre-André
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004520398, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Pietro Bulloni, à Avenches, CHE-101.665.697 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834).
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
Bulloni Pierre-André.
Nouvelle adresse:
Vers l'Eau-Noire, 1580 Avenches. Bulloni Pierre-André est désormais d'Acquarossa.
Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Pietro Bulloni, à Avenches . Le chef de la maison est Pierre-André Bulloni, de Ponte Valentino, à Avenches. La maison a repris l'actif et le passif de la maison "Pietro Bulloni", à Avenches. Alimentation générale.
Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Pietro Bulloni, à Avenches . Alimentation générale (FOSCdu 21.3.1972, p.728). La raison est radiée par suite de décès du titulaire.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.