Reports for Buffalo Grill Suisse SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Buffalo Grill Suisse SA
- Buffalo Grill Suisse SA with its legal headquarters in Crissier is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of restaurants». Buffalo Grill Suisse SA is active.
- The management of the company Buffalo Grill Suisse SA consists of 4 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 03.03.1999.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 30.07.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-102.842.683.
Management (4)
newest board members
Grégory Coutouly,
Robert Guillet,
David Alain Bernard Guffroy,
Jean Pierre Alain Holzmann
newest authorized signatories
Grégory Coutouly,
Robert Guillet,
David Alain Bernard Guffroy,
Jean Pierre Alain Holzmann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.03.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Crissier
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.046.212-0
UID/VAT
CHE-102.842.683
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation de restaurants "Buffalo Grill" en Suisse.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
GF Audit SA | Blonay - Saint-Légier | 10.11.2008 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Holzmann + partenaires SA | Lausanne | 22.05.2007 | 09.11.2008 | |
Fidutec Audit SA | Fribourg | <2004 | 21.05.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Buffalo Grill Suisse S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Buffalo Grill Suisse SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006097307, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Buffalo Grill Suisse SA, à Crissier, CHE-102.842.683 (FOSC du 26.02.2024, p. 0/1005970833). Coutouly Grégory, de France, à Publier (France), est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005970833, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Buffalo Grill Suisse SA, à Crissier, CHE-102.842.683 (FOSC du 08.09.2022, p. 0/1005557922).
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin de Saugy 7, 1023 Crissier. Davignon Frédéric et Lutz Bruno ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Guillet Robert, de France, Versailles (France), président, avec signature individuelle, et Guffroy David, de France, à Chêne-Bourg, avec signature collective à deux, sont membres du conseil d'administration.
Publication number: HR02-1005557922, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Buffalo Grill Suisse SA, à Crissier, CHE-102.842.683 (FOSC du 03.08.2022, p. 0/1005534337). Imeneuraët Nicolas Pierre Guy n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Davignon Frédéric, de France, à Montrouge (France), est membre président du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.