Reports for Brugger Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Brugger Immobilien AG
- Brugger Immobilien AG has its legal headquarters in Gais and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Facility management».
- The company was founded on 01.10.1970 and has 2 persons in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 30.05.2023.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of AR is CHE-107.075.850.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.10.1970
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Gais
Commercial Registry Office
AR
Commercial register number
CH-300.3.010.375-4
UID/VAT
CHE-107.075.850
Sector
Facility management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ankauf von Liegenschaften und Grundstücken sowie Ueberbauungen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, verwerten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treviso Revisions AG | St. Gallen | 17.12.2008 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treviso Treuhand AG St. Gallen | St. Gallen | <2004 | 16.12.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Brugger Immobilien AG, Gais
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Brugger Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005755917, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Brugger Immobilien AG, in Gais, CHE-107.075.850, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 14.04.2023, Publ. 1005724058).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brugger-Glinz, Erika, von Gais, in Gais, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005724058, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Brugger Immobilien AG, in Gais, CHE-107.075.850, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 114 vom 15.06.2017, Publ. 3582199).
Domizil neu:
Rösslistrasse 1, 9056 Gais.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Weiss, Michael, von Basel, in Winterthur, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Brugger-Glinz, Erika, von Gais, in Gais, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates].
Publication number: 3582199, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Brugger Immobilien AG, in Gais, CHE-107.075.850, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 28.12.2016, Publ. 3251629).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Weiss, Elsbeth, von Basel, in Bühler, Präsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vizepräsidentin];
Brugger-Glinz, Erika, von Gais, in Gais, Vizepräsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsidentin].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.