Branches (1)
Reports for BRIMATO (Swiss) AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout BRIMATO (Swiss) AG
- BRIMATO (Swiss) AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Tägerwilen. BRIMATO (Swiss) AG belongs to the industry «Other construction» and is currently active.
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 20.06.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company BRIMATO (Swiss) AG is registered under the UID CHE-114.914.964.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.06.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Tägerwilen
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.4.022.220-8
UID/VAT
CHE-114.914.964
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Beratung, Projektierung und Ausführung von Kühl -, Tiefkühl- und Klimaraumbauten sowie die Projektierung, Beratung und Ausführung von industriellen Grossküchen und Automatisierungsanlagen; Handel mit dazu nötigen Komponenten wie Dämmelemente, Isoliertüren, Lagerregale, Küchengeräten, Ersatzteilen und verwandten Produkten; Sanierung und Unterhalt der verbauten Anlagen mit technischem Kundendienst. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In - und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In - und Ausland beteiligen und Werkvertretungen übernehmen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen die direkt oder indirekt mit Ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In - und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SRG Schweizerische Revisionsgesellschaft AG | Zürich | 25.07.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SRC Wirtschaftsprüfungen GmbH in Liquidation | Kreuzlingen | 09.10.2015 | 24.07.2022 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- BRIMATO Swiss GmbH
- Fupa Commerce GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: BRIMATO (Swiss) AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006062706, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
BRIMATO (Swiss) AG, in Tägerwilen, CHE-114.914.964, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 69 vom 11.04.2023, Publ. 1005720777).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Furrer, Joris Julius Stefan, von Eschenbach (SG), in Tägerwilen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005720777, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
BRIMATO (Swiss) AG, in Tägerwilen, CHE-114.914.964, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 54 vom 17.03.2023, Publ. 1005703313).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Urech, Silvia, von Hallwil, in Thundorf, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005703313, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
BRIMATO (Swiss) AG, in Tägerwilen, CHE-114.914.964, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 142 vom 25.07.2022, Publ. 1005528382).
Zweigniederlassung neu:
Pfyn (CHE-392.919.556).
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.