Reports for Brasserie Holding SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Brasserie Holding SA
- Brasserie Holding SA is active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Lenzburg.
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 15.04.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-102.917.789.
Management (4)
newest board members
Yvonne von Gemmingen-Hornberg May,
Marcus von Gemmingen-Hornberg,
Robin Freiherr von Gemmingen-Hornberg,
Dr. Erwin Robert Griesshammer
newest authorized signatories
Yvonne von Gemmingen-Hornberg May,
Marcus von Gemmingen-Hornberg,
Robin Freiherr von Gemmingen-Hornberg,
Dr. Erwin Robert Griesshammer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.07.1959
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lenzburg
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.904.228-8
UID/VAT
CHE-102.917.789
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb und die Verwaltung von Beteiligungen aller Art, die Vermögensverwaltung auf eigene und fremde Rechnung sowie Tätigung aller Geschäfte, die damit zusammenhängen können. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, Immobilien und Grundstücke erwerben, veräussern und verwalten sowie sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Interconsulta Revisions- und Treuhand AG | Zürich | 15.04.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ledergerber Revisions GmbH | Gossau (SG) | 01.11.2022 | 14.04.2024 | |
Controlla AG | Frauenfeld | <2004 | 31.10.2022 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Brasserie-Holding SA
- Brasserie-Holding S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Brasserie Holding SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006008974, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Brasserie Holding SA, in Lenzburg, CHE-102.917.789, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2022, Publ. 1005594974).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ledergerber Revisions GmbH (CHE-115.980.656), in Gossau (SG), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Gemmingen-Hornberg, Marcus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Maur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Neckarzimmern (DE)];
von Gemmingen-Hornberg, Robin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Küsnacht (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Berlin (DE)];
Interconsulta Revisions- und Treuhand AG (CHE-105.836.816), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005594974, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Brasserie Holding SA, in Lenzburg, CHE-102.917.789, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 221 vom 12.11.2021, Publ. 1005333016).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Controlla AG (CHE-105.877.933), in Frauenfeld, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ledergerber Revisions GmbH (CHE-115.980.656), in Gossau (SG), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005333016, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Brasserie-Holding SA, in Lenzburg, CHE-102.917.789, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 26.05.2021, Publ. 1005192748).
Statutenänderung:
22.10.2021.
Firma neu:
Brasserie Holding SA.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb und die Verwaltung von Beteiligungen aller Art, die Vermögensverwaltung auf eigene und fremde Rechnung sowie Tätigung aller Geschäfte, die damit zusammenhängen können. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, Immobilien und Grundstücke erwerben, veräussern und verwalten sowie sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Veröffentlichung im Publikationsorgan oder, sofern Namen und Adressen aller Aktionäre bekannt sind und das Gesetz nicht zwingend etwas anderes vorschreibt, durch eingeschriebenen Brief oder digital.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.