Address
c/o Lutz Freiwald
Rebbergstrasse 28
8964 Rudolfstetten
Reports for BESTMINDS GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout BESTMINDS GmbH
- BESTMINDS GmbH is a Limited liability company with its legal headquarters in Rudolfstetten. BESTMINDS GmbH belongs to the industry «Services regarding management consulting» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 04.04.2011.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 25.03.2022.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-388.673.990.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.04.2011
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Rudolfstetten-Friedlisberg
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.044.745-4
UID/VAT
CHE-388.673.990
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Gegenstand des Unternehmens ist die Personal- und Unternehmensberatung für Industrie, Dienstleistung und Handel, vornehmlich in den Branchen Medizintechnik, Biotechnologie, Informationstechnik, neue Medien, Logistik und weiteren Industriezweigen, einschliesslich Interimsmanagement, sowie alle damit unmittelbar oder mittelbar in Verbindung stehenden Geschäfte, insbesondere in der Schweiz sowie Entwicklung und Vermarktung von Unternehmenskonzepten im Bereich Personal- und Unternehmensberatung. Die Gesellschaft ist zu allen Geschäften und Massnahmen berechtigt, die dem Gegenstand des Unternehmens und dessen weitere Expansion dienen. Die Gesellschaft ist befugt, gleichartige oder ähnliche Unternehmen zu erwerben, zu pachten, sich an solchen zu beteiligen, deren persönliche Haftung und Vertretung zu übernehmen, Betriebsstätten und Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland zu errichten sowie alle Geschäfte zu betreiben, die geeignet sind, die Unternehmungen der Gesellschaft zu fördern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: BESTMINDS GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005435833, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
BESTMINDS GmbH, in Wettingen, CHE-388.673.990, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 218 vom 11.11.2013, S.0, Publ. 1171833).
Statutenänderung:
25.02.2022.
Sitz neu:
Rudolfstetten-Friedlisberg.
Domizil neu:
c/o Lutz Freiwald, Rebbergstrasse 28, 8964 Rudolfstetten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Freiwald, Lutz, von Baden, in Rudolfstetten-Friedlisberg, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wettingen].
Publication number: 1171833, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
BESTMINDS GmbH, bisher in Zürich, CHE-388.673.990, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 202 vom 17.10.2012, Publ. 6894148).
Gründungsstatuten:
28.03.2011.
Statutenänderung:
03.10.2013.
Sitz neu:
Wettingen.
Domizil neu:
c/o Lutz Freiwald, Schartenstrasse 80, 5430 Wettingen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Vom Gesetz abweichende Modalitäten für die Abtretung von Stammanteilen gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Llaury, Isabelle, französische Staatsangehörige, in Zürich, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BESTMINDS GmbH, in Freiburg im Breisgau (DE), Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 180 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Freiwald, Lutz, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wettingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1171815, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
BESTMINDS GmbH, in Zürich, CH-020.4.044.745-4, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 202 vom 17.10.2012, Publ. 6894148). Die Gesellschaft wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Wettingen im Handelsregister des Kantons Aargau eingetragen und im Handelsregister des Kantons Zürich von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.