Reports for Bals Elektrotechnik (Schweiz) AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Bals Elektrotechnik (Schweiz) AG
- Bals Elektrotechnik (Schweiz) AG with its legal headquarters in Volketswil is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Trading with machines». Bals Elektrotechnik (Schweiz) AG is active.
- The management of the company Bals Elektrotechnik (Schweiz) AG consists of 4 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 05.04.2011.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 20.12.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Bals Elektrotechnik (Schweiz) AG is the following: CHE-241.476.246.
- Next to the company Bals Elektrotechnik (Schweiz) AG there are 2 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Poweropt GmbH, Speckert Klein Beschriftungen AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Yvonne Vicandi,
Wolfgang Bals,
Daniel König,
Michael Vetterli
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.04.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Volketswil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.036.384-4
UID/VAT
CHE-241.476.246
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Handel mit Industrie- und Elektroprodukten aller Art sowie die Führung aller damit direkt oder indirekt verbundenen Geschäfte. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CORDIS audit AG | Emmen | 20.12.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
WPnet Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Köniz | 19.12.2014 | 19.12.2022 | |
Treuhandbüro Norbert Hutter AG | Elgg | 08.04.2011 | 19.10.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Bals Elektrotechnik (Schweiz) AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005632603, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bals Elektrotechnik (Schweiz) AG, in Volketswil, CHE-241.476.246, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 13.10.2021, Publ. 1005311065).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
WPnet Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-103.542.522), in Muri bei Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
CORDIS audit AG (CHE-107.401.754), in Emmen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005311065, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bals Elektrotechnik (Schweiz) AG, in Oberglatt, CHE-241.476.246, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 88 vom 07.05.2021, Publ. 1005172544).
Statutenänderung:
30.09.2021.
Sitz neu:
Volketswil.
Domizil neu:
Hölzliwisenstrasse 2a, 8604 Volketswil.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Namenaktionäre erfolgen durch Publikation im Schweizerischen Handelsamtsblatt, durch Brief oder elektronische Mitteilung an ihre zuletzt im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vetterli, Michael, von Zürich, in Illnau-Effretikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Richterswil];
Vicandi, Yvonne, von Winterthur, in Volketswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005172544, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Bals Elektrotechnik (Schweiz) AG, in Oberglatt, CHE-241.476.246, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 07.07.2017, S.0, Publ. 3629913).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vetterli, Michael, von Zürich, in Richterswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Volketswil].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.