Reports for Arcasa Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Arcasa Immobilien AG
- Arcasa Immobilien AG with its legal headquarters in Bern is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Arcasa Immobilien AG is active.
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 15.11.2021, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-102.045.824.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.04.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.012.005-0
UID/VAT
CHE-102.045.824
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den An- und Verkauf, Vermittlung, Verwaltung und Bewertung von Immobilien wie auch die Beratung im Zusammenhang mit Immobilien. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen übernehmen oder errichten sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Accontaris Treuhand AG | Zug | 15.07.2010 | 06.09.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Arcasa Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005333887, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Arcasa Immobilien AG, in Schmitten FR, CHE-102.045.824 (SHAB vom 07.09.2015, s. 0/2359081). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Sitzverlegung nach Bern im Handelsregister des Kantons Freiburg von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005333582, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Arcasa Immobilien AG, bisher in Schmitten (FR), CHE-102.045.824, Aktiengesellschaft (vom 07.09.2015, Publ. 2359081).
Statutenänderung:
05.11.2021.
Sitz neu:
Bern.
Domizil neu:
Murifeldweg 66, 3006 Bern.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den An- und Verkauf, Vermittlung, Verwaltung und Bewertung von Immobilien wie auch die Beratung im Zusammenhang mit Immobilien. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen übernehmen oder errichten sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen.
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 100'000.00 [bisher: CHF 50'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: schriftlich oder mittels elektronischer Post.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pfister, Johann, von Trachselwald, in Schmitten FR, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brand, Michael, von Sumiswald, in Niederscherli (Köniz), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Rösti, Andreas Rudolf, von Adelboden, in Hünibach (Hilterfingen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2359119, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Arcasa Immobilien AG, in Vechigen, CHE-102.045.824, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 157 vom 17.08.2015, Publ. 2323995). Die Gesellschaft wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Schmitten FR im Handelsregister des Kantons Freiburg eingetragen und im Handelsregister des Kantons Bern von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.