Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Apotheke Mellingen Dr. Hans M. Dietiker AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.11.2008
Deletion from the commercial register
23.09.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Mellingen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.031.117-1
UID/VAT
CHE-114.599.905
Sector
Drugstore
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Apotheke mit allen dazugehörenden Bereichen; kann auch Parfümerie- und Drogerieartikel vertreiben, Filialen gründen, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen, Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten und veräussern, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Apotheke Mellingen Dr. Hans M. Dietiker AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1004721794, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Apotheke Mellingen Dr. Hans M. Dietiker AG, in Mellingen, CHE-114.599.905, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 17.04.2019, Publ. 1004612872). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die GaleniCare AG, in Bern (CHE-103.239.360), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1004612872, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Apotheke Mellingen Dr. Hans M. Dietiker AG, in Mellingen, CHE-114.599.905, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 20.01.2009, S.1, Publ. 4833970).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dietiker, Dr. Hans M., von Thalheim AG, in Mellingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Dietiker-Schneider, Ursula, von Thalheim AG, in Mellingen, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Dietiker, Alexandra, von Thalheim AG, in Aarau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Präsident oder Vizepräsidentin;
Dietiker, Regina, von Thalheim AG, in Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Präsident oder Vizepräsidentin.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Madonna, Daniele, von Centovalli, in Ronco sopra Ascona, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Burkhard, Felix, von Messen, in Subingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4833970, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Apotheke Mellingen Dr. Hans M. Dietiker AG, in Mellingen, CH-400.3.031.117-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 27.11.2008, S. 1, Publ. 4752406).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dietiker, Regina, von Thalheim AG, in Baden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit Präsident oder Vizepräsidentin [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].