Reports for AOC AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout AOC AG
- AOC AG is currently active and the industry «Production of chemical products». The legal headquarters are in Schaffhausen.
- The management of the company AOC AG, which was founded on the 23.01.2001, consists of 10 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 21.08.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of SH is CHE-101.684.772.
- There are 3 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Dr. med. B. Boldog, Praxis für minimalinvasive Chirurgie, Martin Dent AG, Terex Global GmbH.
Management (10)
newest board members
Lori Martin Browne,
Robert Earl Seidel Jr,
Stefan Peter Osterwind,
Franciscus Johannes Petrus Maria Theeuwes
newest authorized signatories
Francesco Lucchetta,
Johannes Jacobus Dirck Freiherr von Franz,
Lori Martin Browne,
Fernando Miquel Peraire,
Robert Earl Seidel Jr
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.01.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Schaffhausen
Commercial Registry Office
SH
Commercial register number
CH-290.3.013.718-7
UID/VAT
CHE-101.684.772
Sector
Production of chemical products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Herstellung, den Vertrieb und den Handel mit synthetischen Materialien, Polyester-Harzen und anderen chemischen Produkten sowie ähnlichen Materialien. Weiter bezweckt sie die Forschung und Entwicklung sowie die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen in diesen Bereichen. Die Gesellschaft kann im Übrigen alle Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern oder zu erleichtern. Die Gesellschaft kann sich insbesondere an Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie Grundeigentum im In- und Ausland erwerben, belasten oder verkaufen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten. Die Gesellschaft ist Teil der DSM Gruppe und der ChemicaInvest Gruppe und kann bei ihrer Zweckverfolgung auch die Interessen der Gruppe berücksichtigen. Die Gesellschaft kann ihren direkten oder indirekten Tochtergesellschaften sowie Dritten, inklusive ihren direkten und indirekten Aktionären sowie den direkten und indirekten Tochtergesellschaften solcher Aktionäre, Darlehen oder andere direkte oder indirekte Finanzierungen, einschliesslich durch Cash Pooling Verträge, oder Sicherheiten, insbesondere Verpfändung oder treuhänderische Übertragung von Gesellschaftsvermögen oder Garantien aller Art, mit oder ohne Gegenleistung gewähren.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 20.01.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 05.07.2019 | 19.01.2023 | |
Ernst & Young AG | St. Gallen | 29.01.2001 | 04.07.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- AOC LTD
- Aliancys AG
- DSM Composite Resins AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: AOC AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006111041, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
AOC AG, in Schaffhausen, CHE-101.684.772, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 05.07.2024, Publ. 1006077176).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lucchetta, Francesco, von Blonay - Saint-Légier, in Blonay (Blonay - Saint-Légier), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006077176, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
AOC AG, in Schaffhausen, CHE-101.684.772, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 69 vom 10.04.2024, Publ. 1006005536).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Josa Pirretas, Marcos, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Barcelona (ES), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006005536, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
AOC AG, in Schaffhausen, CHE-101.684.772, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 215 vom 06.11.2023, Publ. 1005877466).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Freiherr von Franz, Johannes Jacobus Dirck, niederländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.