Reports for alp architektur lischer partner AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout alp architektur lischer partner AG
- alp architektur lischer partner AG has its legal headquarters in Luzern and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management of the company alp architektur lischer partner AG, which was founded on the 04.06.2003, consists of 4 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 29.11.2023.
- In the commercial register the company alp architektur lischer partner AG is registered under the UID CHE-110.129.481.
- Happy Brands GmbH, Lischer Partner AG, Mullis Immobilien AG have the same address as alp architektur lischer partner AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
Manuel Jakobs,
Oliver von Känel,
Nicole Renggli-Frey,
Daniel Lischer
newest authorized signatories
Manuel Jakobs,
Oliver von Känel,
Nicole Renggli-Frey,
Daniel Lischer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.06.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.027.025-9
UID/VAT
CHE-110.129.481
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung eines Architekturbüros; Ausführung von Architektur- und Planungsleistungen; Beteiligungen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OPES AG | Luzern | 19.12.2017 | 25.04.2019 | |
Beat Achermann Treuhand GmbH in Liquidation | Luzern | <2004 | 21.09.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Lischer Partner Architekten Planer AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: alp architektur lischer partner AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005896398, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
alp architektur lischer partner AG, in Luzern, CHE-110.129.481, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 80 vom 26.04.2019, Publ. 1004617745).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Känel, Oliver, von Aeschi bei Spiez, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jakobs, Manuel, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004617745, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
alp architektur lischer partner AG, in Luzern, CHE-110.129.481, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 102 vom 30.05.2018, Publ. 4257803). Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 18.04.2019 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Egli, André, von Wolhusen, in Wolhusen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Froidevaux, Pascal, von Le Bémont JU, in Bern, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
OPES AG (CHE-102.372.223), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Renggli-Frey, Nicole, von Wolhusen, in Beckenried, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 4257803, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
alp architektur lischer partner AG, in Luzern, CHE-110.129.481, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 19.12.2017, Publ. 3940529).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bieri, Dominik, von Entlebuch, in Emmen, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.