Reports for agtatec ag
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout agtatec ag
- agtatec ag with its legal headquarters in Fehraltorf is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances». agtatec ag is active.
- The management of the company agtatec ag consists of 7 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 12.03.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-105.569.874.
- company agtatec ag has 2 active trademarks, cancelled trademarks or pending applications.
- The address is identical with 5 other active companies. These include: 3B Finance GmbH, ASSA ABLOY Entrance Systems Holding AG, ASSA ABLOY Entrance Systems record AG.
Management (7)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Roman Bodtländer,
Jan Anders Revin,
Markus Walter Kast,
Marina Kristina Agneta Lindholm,
Renato Melillo
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.06.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Fehraltorf
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.023.336-0
UID/VAT
CHE-105.569.874
CHE-116.283.235 VAT
Sector
Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Entwicklung, Herstellung von sowie Handel mit elektrischen Apparaten, im besonderen mit record Türautomationsanlagen sowie Erbringung der damit verbundenen Dienstleistungen; kann sich an andern Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften und immaterielle Rechte erwerben, verwerten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 29.08.2017 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | <2004 | 28.08.2017 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- agtatec sa
- agtatec ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
XPLORER | 04.09.2002 | deleted | 07235/2002 |
RECORD ADM | 13.08.2002 | deleted | 06532/2002 |
Newest SOGC notifications: agtatec ag
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005982830, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
agtatec ag, in Fehraltorf, CHE-105.569.874, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 20.07.2022, Publ. 1005524603).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Katz, Uta, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Hombrechtikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bodtländer, Roman, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Truttikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005524603, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
agtatec ag, in Fehraltorf, CHE-105.569.874, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 19.07.2021, Publ. 1005251887).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Scheffrahn, Raymund, von Geroldswil, in Baar, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Dinnissen, Joseph Dielus Theodorus, niederländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Mönchaltorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Hauri, Marco Andrin Timon, von Hirschthal, in Galgenen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Hirt, Michael, von Würenlingen, in Maur, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Oila, Kari Tapani, finnischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Schneider, Thierry Pascal, von Pfäffikon, in Pfäffikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Revin, Jan Anders, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Pfäffikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005251887, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
agtatec ag, in Fehraltorf, CHE-105.569.874, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 170 vom 02.09.2020, Publ. 1004969420).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Norbye, Christopher Robert Alvar, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Höllviken (SE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kast, Markus Walter, von Rehetobel, in Pfäffikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lindholm, Marina Kristina Agneta, schwedische Staatsangehörige, in Pfäffikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Örebro (SE)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.