Werner Züllig
domiciled in Männedorf, from Amriswil Active mandates: Casmall Holding AG in Liquidation Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Werner Züllig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Werner Züllig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Werner Züllig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Werner Züllig"
|
Places where people with the name Werner Züllig live
Sectors in which people with the name Werner Züllig work
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of other financial institutions
Private persons with the name Werner Züllig
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Werner Züllig
Publication number: HR02-1006110202, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Geberit Produktions AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-105.827.846, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 26.06.2024, Publ. 1006067740).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Probst, Marcel, von Lommiswil, in Jona (Rapperswil-Jona), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Züllig, Werner Ernst, von Wiesendangen, in Aadorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005916416, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 242 vom 13.12.2023 publizierten TR-Eintrag Nr. 50403 vom 08.12.2023 Casmall Holding AG in Liquidation, in Männedorf, CHE-101.151.961, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 13.12.2023, Publ. 1005908433).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Züllig, Werner, von Amriswil, in Männedorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [nicht: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005375807, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Intop AG, in Zug, CHE-101.924.516, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 77 vom 22.04.2021, Publ. 1005156208).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Züllig, Werner, von Amriswil, in Männedorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Oetterli, Fabio, von Pfaffnau, in Mettmenstetten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.