Andreas Wieser
domiciled in St. Ursen, from Weinfelden Active mandates: WieserPartner GmbH Connected persons: Nicole Wieser-Curty You can stay up to date through "Andreas Wieser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andreas Wieser"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Andreas Wieser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andreas Wieser"
|
|
Andreas Wieser
domiciled in Frauenfeld, from Neunkirch Active mandates: Scalis AG, A. Wieser AG Connected persons: Heidi Wieser-Menzi You can stay up to date through "Andreas Wieser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andreas Wieser"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Andreas Wieser", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Andreas Wieser"
|
Places where people with the name Andreas Wieser live
Sectors in which people with the name Andreas Wieser work
Services regarding management consulting
Recruiting agency services
Operation of medical and dental practices
Services regarding management consulting
Recruiting agency services
Operation of medical and dental practices
Private persons with the name Andreas Wieser
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Andreas Wieser
Publication number: HR02-1005769543, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Scalis AG, in Gachnang, CHE-109.320.078, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 77 vom 22.04.2021, Publ. 1005156615).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Wieser Consulting GmbH, in Gachnang (CHE-110.089.410), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 02.06.2023 und Bilanz per 31.12.2022. Aktiven von CHF 256'252.49 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 2'800.00 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da dieselben Aktionäre/Gesellschafter sämtliche Aktien bzw. Stammanteile der an der Fusion beteiligten Gesellschaften halten, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wieser, Andreas, von Neunkirch, in Frauenfeld (Gachnang), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Gachnang];
Wieser, Heidi, von Zürich, Glarus Nord und Neunkirch, in Frauenfeld (Gachnang), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Gachnang].
Publication number: HR02-1005576812, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Reinhardt von Graffenried, in Bern, CHE-115.248.294, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 15.02.2021, Publ. 1005100469).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wieser, Andreas, von Weinfelden, in St. Ursen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
von Graffenried, Michael, von Bern, in Bern, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005419889, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
fondia - Stiftung zur Förderung der Gemeindediakonie in der Evangelisch-reformierten Kirche Schweiz (EKS), in Bern, CHE-110.594.406, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 27.12.2021, Publ. 1005368195).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wieser, Andreas, von Weinfelden, in St. Ursen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schönfelder, Silvia, von Bern, in Unterentfelden, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.