Christian U. Vogel
domiciled in Basel, from Buchs (SG) and Sevelen Active mandates: Vogelschau GmbH, Stiftung Refdata Referenzdaten im schweizerischen Gesundheitswesen Connected persons: Sabine Schläppi, Daniel Gelbart, Andreas Eyholzer and more You can stay up to date through "Christian U. Vogel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian U. Vogel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian U. Vogel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian U. Vogel"
|
Places where people with the name Christian U. Vogel live
Sectors in which people with the name Christian U. Vogel work
Services regarding management consulting
Data processing and hosting services
Services regarding management consulting
Data processing and hosting services
Private persons with the name Christian U. Vogel
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christian U. Vogel
Publication number: HR02-1005218979, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
SPAK AG, in Herisau, CHE-101.103.672, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 14.05.2021, Publ. 1005181184).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vogel, Christian U., von Buchs SG und Sevelen, in Rehetobel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Büchel, Caroline, von Rüthi (SG), in Waldkirch, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates].
Publication number: 1628933, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Stiftung Refdata Referenzdaten im schweizerischen Gesundheitswesen, in Zug, CHE-109.531.422, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 224 vom 16.11.2012, Publ. 6934490).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rutz, Franz, von Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, in Freienbach, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Vogel, Christian, von Buchs SG, in Rehetobel, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 1575637, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
NVS Beteiligungs AG, in Herisau, CHE-107.435.463, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 18.06.2012, Publ. 6722006).
Firma neu:
NVS Beteiligungs AG in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 18.06.2014 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Vogel, Christian U., von Buchs SG und Sevelen, in Rehetobel, Präsident und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident];
Brülisauer, Johannes K., von Appenzell, in Herisau, Mitglied und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied].