Roland Urech
domiciled in Goldau, from Seon Active mandates: Dim Sum GmbH Connected persons: Hui Zhang Urech You can stay up to date through "Roland Urech", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Urech"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Roland Urech", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Urech"
|
|
Roland Urech
domiciled in Hallwil, from Hallwil Active mandates: LANDI UNTERES SEETAL, Genossenschaft Connected persons: Andrea Weber-Nussbaumer, Matthias Haldimann, Thomas Christen and more You can stay up to date through "Roland Urech", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Urech"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Roland Urech", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Urech"
|
|
Roland Urech
domiciled in Buchs, from Brunegg Active mandates: Roland Urech Photography Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Roland Urech", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Urech"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Roland Urech", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Urech"
|
Places where people with the name Roland Urech live
Sectors in which people with the name Roland Urech work
Operation of restaurants
Trading with various goods
Photography, Operation of photo labs
Operation of restaurants
Trading with various goods
Photography, Operation of photo labs
Private persons with the name Roland Urech
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Roland Urech
Publication number: HR02-1005719352, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Roland Urech Photography, in Staufen, CHE-369.444.199, Einzelunternehmen (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 03.07.2019, Publ. 1004666672).
Sitz neu:
Buchs (AG).
Domizil neu:
Gislifluestrasse 19, 5033 Buchs AG.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Urech, Roland, von Brunegg, in Buchs (AG), Inhaber, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Staufen].
Publication number: 2828965, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
LANDI UNTERES SEETAL, Genossenschaft, in Seon, CHE-105.770.353, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 02.05.2013, Publ. 7174326).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Trachsel, Peter, von Frutigen, in Seon, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Waser, Rudolf, von Engelberg, in Schafisheim, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zubler, Stefan, von Hunzenschwil, in Schafisheim, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Urech, Roland, von Hallwil, in Hallwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 5026624, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Urmax AG, in Dintikon, CH-400.3.009.763-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 16.10.2003, S. 2, Publ. 1217312).
Firma neu:
Urmax AG in Liq..
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 18.03.2009 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Urech, Max, von Hallwil, in Niederlenz, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Urech, Hermine, von Hallwil, in Niederlenlz, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Urech, André, von Hallwil, in Schafisheim, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Strasser & Vögtli Treuhand AG, in Küttigen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Urech, Roland, von Hallwil, in Zürich, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].