Georg Troxler
domiciled in Neuchâtel, from Zürich Active mandates: staila technologies GmbH Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Georg Troxler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Georg Troxler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Georg Troxler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Georg Troxler"
|
Places where people with the name Georg Troxler live
Sectors in which people with the name Georg Troxler work
IT services
IT services
Private persons with the name Georg Troxler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Georg Troxler
Publication number: 1367325, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Aebi & Co. AG Maschinenfabrik, in Burgdorf, CHE-102.581.896, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 217 vom 08.11.2013, Publ. 1169763).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Troxler, Georges, von Neuenkirch, in Küssnacht SZ, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scheuber, Robert, von Wolfenschiessen, in Oberkirch, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1226329, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
staila technologies GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-114.678.746, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 24.09.2010, S. 22, Publ. 5825782).
Statutenänderung:
26.11.2013.
Sitz neu:
Gossau ZH.
Domizil neu:
Gerbelstrasse 5, 8626 Ottikon (Gossau ZH).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Troxler, Georg, von Zürich, in Neuchâtel, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 180 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Zürich].
Publication number: 5825782, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
staila technologies GmbH, in Zürich, CH-020.4.039.347-3, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 78 vom 23.04.2010, S. 21, Publ. 5600626).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
De Nardo, Mikko, von Zürich, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 51 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Troxler, Georg, von Zürich, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 180 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung mit Einzelunterschrift und mit 129 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].