Paul Trachsel
domiciled in St. Antoni, from Thurnen Active mandates: Tierarztpraxis Trachsel GmbH Connected persons: Ursula Trachsel-Graeser You can stay up to date through "Paul Trachsel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Paul Trachsel"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Paul Trachsel", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Paul Trachsel"
|
Places where people with the name Paul Trachsel live
Sectors in which people with the name Paul Trachsel work
Veterinary medicine
Veterinary medicine
Private persons with the name Paul Trachsel
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Paul Trachsel
Publication number: 3349166, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
GEOMENS Sàrl, à Delémont, CH-670.4.003.015-3, Exploitation d'un bureau d'ingénieurs-géomètres. Société à responsabilité limitée (FOSC no 105 du 02.06.2005, p. 7, publ. 2863360).
Modification des statuts:
11.04.2006.
Personne et signature radiée:
Trachsel, Paul, de Frutigen, à Delémont, associé, sans droit de signature, pour une part sociale de CHF 3'000.--.
Inscription ou modification de personnes:
Micaux, Ghislaine, de Welschenrohr, à Levoncourt (F), associée, sans droit de signature, pour une part sociale de CHF 1'000.--;
Stadelmann, Germain, de Pleigne, à Porrentruy, associé, sans droit de signature, pour une part sociale de CHF 2'000.--.
Publication number: 3021144, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Symphonisches Orchester Zürich, in Zürich, CH-020.6.900.476-0, Bezweckt, durch regelmässige Konzerte in Zürich und seiner weiteren Umgebung das kulturelle Leben zu bereichern, Verein (SHAB Nr. 227 vom 22.11.2004, S. 22, Publ. 2552674).
Domizil neu:
Hallwylstrasse 78, 8004 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Trachsel, Paul, von Zürich, in Kilchberg ZH, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schweizer, Daniel, von Lampenberg, in Bonstetten, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied];
Eberle, Felix, von Zürich und Häggenschwil, in Kaiserstuhl, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2501530, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Visana Beteiligungen AG, in Muri bei Bern, CH-160.3.000.705-9, Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen jeder Art usw., Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 53 vom 19.03.2003, S. 3, Publ. 909510).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Trachsel, Paul, von Rüeggisberg, in Köniz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Humbel, Peter Dr., von Oberrohrdorf, in Grüt (Gossau ZH), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.