Kevin Steiger
domiciled in Allschwil, from Allschwil Active mandates: Cruise Invest Capital GP AG in Liquidation, Pensionskasse Bank CIC (Schweiz) and more Connected persons: Kai-Michael Pappert, Sandro Michel Hattemer, Roland Burger and more You can stay up to date through "Kevin Steiger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Kevin Steiger"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Kevin Steiger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Kevin Steiger"
|
|
Kevin Steiger
domiciled in Altstätten, from Altstätten Active mandates: Reise-Treff Steiger AG Connected persons: Zenaida Steiger-Hipolito, Urs Josef Steiger You can stay up to date through "Kevin Steiger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Kevin Steiger"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Kevin Steiger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Kevin Steiger"
|
Places where people with the name Kevin Steiger live
Sectors in which people with the name Kevin Steiger work
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of an pension fund
Fund management
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Travel agency and tour operator services
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of an pension fund
Fund management
Operation of banks and credit institutions
Travel agency and tour operator services
Private persons with the name Kevin Steiger
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Kevin Steiger
Publication number: HR02-1005771769, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Cruise Invest Capital GP AG, in Basel, CHE-204.107.603, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 168 vom 31.08.2021, Publ. 1005280895).
Firma neu:
Cruise Invest Capital GP AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Cruise Invest Capital GP SA en liquidation) (Cruise Invest Capital GP Ltd in liquidation). Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 07.06.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steiger, Kevin, von Allschwil, in Allschwil, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005769299, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Pensionskasse Bank CIC (Schweiz), in Basel, CHE-109.713.756, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 93 vom 15.05.2023, Publ. 1005746229).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meyer, Rolf, von Basel, in Biel-Benken, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Steiger, Kevin, von Allschwil, in Allschwil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005742896, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Stiftung Sparen 3 der Bank CIC (Schweiz) AG, in Basel, CHE-109.836.011, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 159 vom 18.08.2022, Publ. 1005543327).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Thomas, von Binningen, in Uitikon, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Marugg, Sandra, von Conters im Prättigau, in Brugg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kälin, Matthias, von Einsiedeln, in Hausen (AG), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Steiger, Kevin, von Allschwil, in Allschwil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.