Elisabeth Steger Vogt
domiciled in Uzwil, from Altstätten Active mandates: Stiftung Kantonsschule Trogen Connected persons: Michelle Jasmin Berger, Edgar Romer, Johannes Schläpfer and more You can stay up to date through "Elisabeth Steger Vogt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Elisabeth Steger Vogt"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Elisabeth Steger Vogt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Elisabeth Steger Vogt"
|
Places where people with the name Elisabeth Steger Vogt live
Sectors in which people with the name Elisabeth Steger Vogt work
Religious, political or secular associations
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Elisabeth Steger Vogt
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Elisabeth Steger Vogt
Publication number: HR02-1005597243, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
wittlin stauffer ag, in Zürich, CHE-114.029.619, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 17.07.2020, Publ. 1004939269).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sturzenegger, Ronnie, von Reute (AR), in Männedorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Steger Vogt, Elisabeth, von Altstätten, in Uzwil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Magno, Aldo, von Weggis, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005135950, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Stiftung Kantonsschule Trogen, in Trogen, CHE-141.023.275, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 62 vom 29.03.2019, Publ. 1004599039).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Buchmann, Ursula, von Zürich, in Speicher, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kummer, Markus, genannt Marc, von Krattigen, in Hettlingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Berger, Michelle, von Gurzelen, in Appenzell, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Steger Vogt, Elisabeth, von Altstätten, in Uzwil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004773166, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
wittlin stauffer ag, in Zürich, CHE-114.029.619, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 08.01.2019, Publ. 1004535305). [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung der Gründer vom 07.01.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
OBT AG (CHE-384.364.751), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle;
Steger Vogt, Elisabeth, von Altstätten, in Uzwil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.