Urs Sonderegger
domiciled in Widnau, from Oberegg Active mandates: rhytec GmbH in Liquidation, Sonderegger Quirin AG and more Connected persons: Raphael Sonderegger, Corinne Sonderegger You can stay up to date through "Urs Sonderegger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Sonderegger"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Urs Sonderegger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Sonderegger"
|
|
Urs Sonderegger
domiciled in Egnach, from Rehetobel Active mandates: Somag-Maschinen-AG Connected persons: Christa Sonderegger-Imthurn You can stay up to date through "Urs Sonderegger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Sonderegger"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Urs Sonderegger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Sonderegger"
|
|
Urs Sonderegger
domiciled in Zumikon, from Zumikon Active mandates: Baugenossenschaft Gewerbe Zumikon BGZ, Sonderegger AG Zumikon Connected persons: Nico Bernasconi, Adrian Jörg Niklaus Rappold, Thomas Epprecht and more You can stay up to date through "Urs Sonderegger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Sonderegger"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Urs Sonderegger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Sonderegger"
|
Places where people with the name Urs Sonderegger live
Sectors in which people with the name Urs Sonderegger work
Manufacturing of electronic components
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Trading with machines
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work
Manufacturing of electronic components
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Trading with machines
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Carpentry, roof construction and general timber work
Private persons with the name Urs Sonderegger
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Urs Sonderegger
Publication number: HR02-1005613117, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
rhytec GmbH, in Widnau, CHE-480.552.627, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 247 vom 20.12.2016, S.0, Publ. 3234043).
Firma neu:
rhytec GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 03.10.2022 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sonderegger, Urs, von Oberegg, in Widnau, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004979850, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Sonderegger Quirin AG, in Widnau, CHE-102.501.265, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 20.02.2014, S.0, Publ. 1357647).
Domizil neu:
Parkstrasse 4, 9443 Widnau.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sonderegger, Quirin, von Oberegg, in Widnau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Sonderegger, Emmi, von Oberegg, in Widnau, mit Einzelprokura.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sonderegger, Urs, von Oberegg, in Widnau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Sonderegger, Raphael, von Oberegg, in Widnau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004882099, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
Atelier2000 LOOK GmbH, in Hergiswil (NW), CHE-110.059.567, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 53 vom 18.03.2019, Publ. 1004589613).
Die Erbengemeinschaft Urs Sonderegger besteht aus:
Francinete Sonderegger, brasilianische Staatsangehörige, in Engelberg, Ida Sonderegger-Giger, von Altstätten, in Egerkingen und Maria da Conceicao Covelo Aguiar, portugisische Staatsangehörige in Obersiggenthal.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sonderegger, Urs, von Altstätten, in Engelberg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Erbengemeinschaft Urs Sonderegger, in Engelberg, Gesellschafterin, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Gabriel, Othmar, von Ennetbürgen, in Sarnen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.