Philip Senn
domiciled in Höri, from Höri Active mandates: Pizsport AG, Veloplus AG Connected persons: Dominique Metz, Martin Wunderli, Bernhard Städler and more You can stay up to date through "Philip Senn", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Philip Senn"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Philip Senn", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Philip Senn"
|
|
Philip Senn
domiciled in Zürich, from Hendschiken Active mandates: All Out Golf GmbH Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Philip Senn", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Philip Senn"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Philip Senn", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Philip Senn"
|
Places where people with the name Philip Senn live
Sectors in which people with the name Philip Senn work
Trading with recreational products
Other services: entertainment and recreation
Trading with recreational products
Other services: entertainment and recreation
Private persons with the name Philip Senn
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Philip Senn
Publication number: HR02-1006105375, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
IMSA Development AG, in Freienbach, CHE-250.975.086, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 44 vom 04.03.2021, Publ. 1005115210).
Domizil neu:
Churerstrasse 160a, 8808 Pfäffikon SZ.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Senn, Philipp Michael, von Liestal, in Freienbach, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gerber, Ron Fabian, von Langnau im Emmental, in Freienbach, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005833891, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
MANDARA SERVICES GmbH, in Freienbach, CHE-105.621.227, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 240 vom 09.12.2020, Publ. 1005043036).
Firma neu:
MANDARA SERVICES GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 31.08.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Senn, Philipp Michael, von Liestal, in Freienbach, Gesellschafter, Geschäftsführer und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005529837, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
ZBSM Zakhar Bron School of Music, in Zürich, CHE-443.987.062, Verein (SHAB Nr. 80 vom 26.04.2022, Publ. 1005458055).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Senn, Philipp, von Liestal, in Freienbach, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Metzke, Tobias, von Zürich, in Rifferswil, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Einzelunterschrift.