Sonja Santhiram
domiciled in Wettswil, from Germany Active mandates: SEKISUI ALVEO AG Connected persons: Neil Beckhusen, Ryosuke Kusaka, Yasuhiro Hirayama and more You can stay up to date through "Sonja Santhiram", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Sonja Santhiram"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Sonja Santhiram", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Sonja Santhiram"
|
Places where people with the name Sonja Santhiram live
Sectors in which people with the name Sonja Santhiram work
Technical, physical and chemical testing
Technical, physical and chemical testing
Private persons with the name Sonja Santhiram
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Sonja Santhiram
Publication number: HR02-1004802398, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
SEKISUI ALVEO AG, in Adligenswil, CHE-102.864.265, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 147 vom 02.08.2019, Publ. 1004688540).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Suganami, Hiroshi, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Tokio (JP), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stoll, Rémy Cédric, von Schaffhausen, in Männedorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Santhiram, Sonja, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Wettswil am Albis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Cham];
Takaki, Kenichi, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Kawasaki (JP), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004688540, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
SEKISUI ALVEO AG, in Luzern, CHE-102.864.265, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 56 vom 21.03.2019, Publ. 1004592755).
Statutenänderung:
05.07.2019.
Sitz neu:
Adligenswil.
Domizil neu:
Ebikonerstrasse 75, 6043 Adligenswil.
Weitere Adressen:
[gestrichen: Ebikonerstrasse 75, 6043 Adligenswil].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bider, Markus, von Basel und Langenbruck, in Horw, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fritschi, Martin, von Gommiswald, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Santhiram, Sonja, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Cham, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Suganami, Hiroshi, japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Tokio (JP), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1274505, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
SEKISUI ALVEO AG, in Luzern, CHE-102.864.265, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 109 vom 10.06.2013, Publ. 7221682).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bürklin, Oliver Hermann, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wolhusen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Luttmer, Jörg Michael, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Märstetten, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Santhiram, Sonja, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Cham, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Ernst & Young AG (CHE-491.907.686)[CH-020.9.001.069-0], in Zürich, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Ernst & Young AG, in Zürich (CH-020.9.001.069-0)].