Christof Rothenfluh
domiciled in Hergiswil, from Stansstad Active mandates: Küng-Leibacher & Cie AG Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Christof Rothenfluh", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christof Rothenfluh"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christof Rothenfluh", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christof Rothenfluh"
|
Places where people with the name Christof Rothenfluh live
Sectors in which people with the name Christof Rothenfluh work
Production and processing of paper and carboard goods
Production and processing of paper and carboard goods
Private persons with the name Christof Rothenfluh
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christof Rothenfluh
Publication number: HR02-1004937323, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Küng-Leibacher & Cie AG, in Luzern, CHE-102.533.176, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 25.01.2012, S.0, Publ. 6519574).
Domizil neu:
Luzernerstrasse 127, 6014 Luzern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Küng, Kaspar, 1945, von Luzern, in Luzern, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Küng, Simona, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Küng, Gertrud, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rothenfluh, Christof, von Stansstad, in Hergiswil (NW), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004805132, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Bombelli Siebdruck AG, in Luzern, CHE-107.245.307, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 06.04.2010, S.11, Publ. 5571376).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rothenfluh, Christof, von Stansstad, in Stansstad, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Holenstein, Pascal, von Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, in Hitzkirch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Alt St. Johann, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 5571376, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Bombelli Siebdruck AG, bisher in Littau, CH-100.3.004.774-1, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 93 vom 15.05.2009, S. 11, Publ. 5021064).
Sitz neu:
Luzern.
Domizil neu:
Grossmatte 28, 6014 Luzern. [Gemeindefusion per 01.01.2010 ohne Anpassung der Statuten].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vonmoos, Peter, von Luzern, in Luzern, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Holenstein, Pascal, von Alt St. Johann, in Hitzkirch, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied];
Rothenfluh, Christof, von Stansstad, in Stansstad, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.