Marco Peyer
domiciled in Oberrieden, from Bergdietikon and Dietikon Active mandates: Verein Revival Fire Ministries Connected persons: Claudia Peyer-Studinger You can stay up to date through "Marco Peyer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Peyer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marco Peyer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Peyer"
|
|
Marco Peyer
domiciled in Bern, from Dietikon Active mandates: MAROMI AG, Marco Peyer Connected persons: Roswitha Peyer You can stay up to date through "Marco Peyer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Peyer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marco Peyer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Peyer"
|
|
Marco Peyer
domiciled in Altendorf, from Zürich Active mandates: risktec AG Connected persons: Sandro Sante Nardi, René Turra You can stay up to date through "Marco Peyer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Peyer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Marco Peyer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Marco Peyer"
|
Places where people with the name Marco Peyer live
Sectors in which people with the name Marco Peyer work
Religious, political or secular associations
IT services
Services regarding management consulting
Religious, political or secular associations
IT services
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Marco Peyer
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Marco Peyer
Publication number: HR02-1005581086, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
risktec AG, in Zürich, CHE-411.282.750, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 123 vom 28.06.2022, Publ. 1005505972).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Turra, René, von Küsnacht (ZH), in Zumikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Nardi, Sandro Sante, liechtensteinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Schlieren, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Peyer, Marco, von Zürich, in Altendorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004904662, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
MAROMI AG, in Laupen, CHE-388.270.089, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 158 vom 19.08.2013, S.0, Publ. 1032529).
Statutenänderung:
28.05.2020.
Sitz neu:
Lenk.
Domizil neu:
Buggeli 8, 3775 Lenk im Simmental.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Peyer, Roswitha, von Dietikon, in Bern, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Peyer-Strothenke, Roswitha, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Laupen BE (Laupen), Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Peyer, Marco, von Dietikon, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Laupen BE (Laupen), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004792042, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Levantis AG, in Belp, CHE-102.236.005, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 10 vom 16.01.2019, Publ. 1004542632).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Peyer, Marco, von Dietikon, in Laupen BE (Laupen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hurni, Patrik, von Gurbrü, in Muntelier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.