Roland Niederberger
domiciled in Beckenried, from Dallenwil Active mandates: KAPELLSTIFTUNG MARIA RICKENBACH Connected persons: Petra Liem, Christoph Baumgartner, Stefan Peter Flury and more You can stay up to date through "Roland Niederberger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Niederberger"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Roland Niederberger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Niederberger"
|
|
Roland Niederberger
domiciled in Laufen, from Wolfenschiessen Active mandates: Bäckerei-Konditorei Niederberger-Giger Connected persons: Andrea Niederberger-Giger You can stay up to date through "Roland Niederberger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Niederberger"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Roland Niederberger", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Niederberger"
|
Places where people with the name Roland Niederberger live
Sectors in which people with the name Roland Niederberger work
Religious, political or secular associations
Production of bread and pastry
Religious, political or secular associations
Production of bread and pastry
Private persons with the name Roland Niederberger
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Roland Niederberger
Publication number: HR02-1005932526, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Amadeus, in Winterthur, CHE-109.998.932, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 94 vom 16.05.2023, Publ. 1005747000).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zumbrunn, Esther Béatrice, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Niderberger, Roland, von Dallenwil, in Elgg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gräf, Hans Rudolf, von Zürich, in Winterthur, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Boner, Urs Niklaus, von Laupersdorf, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Joelson-Strohbach, Margarethe, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005747000, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 89 vom 09.05.2023 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 18'538 vom 04.05.2023 Stiftung Amadeus, in Winterthur, CHE-109.998.932, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 09.05.2023, Publ. 1005741408).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niderberger, Roland, von Dallenwil, in Elgg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: Niederberger, Roland].
Publication number: HR02-1005741408, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Amadeus, in Winterthur, CHE-109.998.932, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2022, Publ. 1005594617).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Joelson, Harry, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mörgeli, Yvonne, von Schlatt ZH, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niederberger, Roland, von Dallenwil, in Elgg, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.