Johannes Muntwyler
domiciled in Wohlen, from Wohlen (AG) Active mandates: Circus Monti AG Connected persons: Nicola Muntwyler, Mario Muntwyler, Tobias Muntwyler and more You can stay up to date through "Johannes Muntwyler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Johannes Muntwyler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Johannes Muntwyler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Johannes Muntwyler"
|
Places where people with the name Johannes Muntwyler live
Sectors in which people with the name Johannes Muntwyler work
Creative, artistic and entertainment services
Creative, artistic and entertainment services
Private persons with the name Johannes Muntwyler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Johannes Muntwyler
Publication number: 2119329, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Zirkus und Zeltvermietung Alfredo Nock AG, in Märstetten, CHE-112.675.091, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 8 vom 14.01.2015, Publ. 1928079).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bader, Michael, von Suhr und Holderbank AG, in Mur (Vully), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Batec Consulting AG, in Belp (CH-035.3.010.848-3), Revisionsstelle;
Bernhard, Ruth, von Neftenbach, in Märstetten, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Nock, Alfredo, von Aegerten, in Märstetten, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Muntwyler, Johannes, von Wohlen AG, in Wohlen AG, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Wohlen, in Wohlen, ohne eingetragene Funktion mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Herzog Treuhand AG (CHE-106.004.497), in Stein AG, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 1928079, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Zirkus und Zeltvermietung Alfredo Nock AG, in Märstetten, CHE-112.675.091, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 25.08.2011, Publ. 6308198).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Muntwyler, Johannes, von Wohlen, in Wohlen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1330839, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
HUH Management & PR-Beratung GmbH, in Wittnau, CHE-113.993.398, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 14.02.2013, Publ. 7064624).
Firma neu:
HUH Management & PR-Beratung GmbH in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Gesellschafterversammlung vom 30.01.2014 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Muntwyler, Johannes, von Wohlen AG, in Wohlen AG, Gesellschafter und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift als Liquidator, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift].