Dr. Matthias Michlig
domiciled in Schlieren, from Naters Active mandates: Michlig Knutti Partner AG Connected persons: Roland Knutti You can stay up to date through "Dr. Matthias Michlig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Matthias Michlig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dr. Matthias Michlig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dr. Matthias Michlig"
|
Places where people with the name Matthias Michlig live
Sectors in which people with the name Matthias Michlig work
Notary and advocate office
Notary and advocate office
Private persons with the name Matthias Michlig
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Matthias Michlig
Publication number: HR02-1005947132, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pfander-Grieder-Stiftung, in Meilen, CHE-100.649.402, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 24.01.2023, Publ. 1005659723).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Michlig, Dr. Matthias, von Naters, in Schlieren, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Caracciolo, Luca, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wetzikon (ZH), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005163388, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Michlig Schmid Partner AG, in Zürich, CHE-409.323.629, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 218 vom 09.11.2018, Publ. 1004494074).
Statutenänderung:
24.03.2021.
Firma neu:
Michlig Knutti Partner AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Michlig Knutti Partner SA) (Michlig Knutti Partner Ltd.).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Michlig, Dr. Matthias, von Naters, in Schlieren, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Knutti, Roland, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004964768, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pfander-Grieder-Stiftung, in Dübendorf, CHE-100.649.402, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 16.03.2020, Publ. 1004852860).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Camenzind, Niklaus, von Gersau, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pfander Patruno, Mirjam, von Zürich und Oberwil im Simmental, in Meilen, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Zürich, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Henzelmann, Erich Walter, von Laupen, in Bubikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Michlig, Dr. Matthias, von Naters, in Schlieren, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.