Martin Mayr
domiciled in Winterthur, from Arbon Active mandates: Mayr Strom Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Martin Mayr", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Mayr"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Mayr", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Mayr"
|
|
Martin Mayr
domiciled in Leonding, from Austria Active mandates: backaldrin Suisse AG Connected persons: Wolfgang Daume, Monica Perera, Sergio Nervi and more You can stay up to date through "Martin Mayr", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Mayr"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Martin Mayr", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Martin Mayr"
|
Places where people with the name Martin Mayr live
Sectors in which people with the name Martin Mayr work
Other construction
Production of bread and pastry
Other construction
Production of bread and pastry
Private persons with the name Martin Mayr
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Martin Mayr
Publication number: 2439635, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Zumtobel Licht AG, in Zürich, CHE-105.895.492, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 64 vom 02.04.2015, Publ. 2077821).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Salinger, Steffen, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Ladenburg (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mayr, Martin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Högger, Georg, von Schönholzerswilen, in Uzwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Triefenbach, Klaus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hannover (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2077821, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 38 vom 25.02.2015 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 7'108 vom 20.02.2015Zumtobel Licht AG, in Zürich, CHE-105.895.492, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 38 vom 25.02.2015, Publ. 2008875). Martin Mayr wurde mit dem im SHAB-Nr. 38 vom 25.02.2015 publizierten TR-Eintrag 7108/2015 irrtümlich gelöscht anstatt mutiert. Deshalb erfolgt nachstehende Eintragung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mayr, Martin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien. .
Publication number: 2008875, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Zumtobel Licht AG, in Zürich, CHE-105.895.492, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 226 vom 21.11.2014, Publ. 1835565).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eggenberger, Jörg, von Grabs, in Langnau am Albis, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Mayr, Martin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zug, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Salinger, Steffen, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Ladenburg (DE), Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.