Sandra Marie Louw
domiciled in Küsnacht, from Küsnacht (ZH) and Neuseeland Active mandates: Trident Trust (Switzerland) AG, Trident Corporate Services AG Connected persons: Markus Grossmann, Mark Everard Dietrich, Markus Grossmann You can stay up to date through "Sandra Marie Louw", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Sandra Marie Louw"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Sandra Marie Louw", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Sandra Marie Louw"
|
Places where people with the name Sandra Marie Louw live
Sectors in which people with the name Sandra Marie Louw work
Fund management
Services regarding management consulting
Fund management
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Sandra Marie Louw
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Sandra Marie Louw
Publication number: HR02-1004501242, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Trident Corporate Services AG, in Zürich, CHE-101.490.529, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 06.07.2016, Publ. 2935487).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grossmann, Markus, von Oberried am Brienzersee, in Widen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Louw, Sandra, neuseeländische Staatsangehörige, in Küsnacht (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2913515, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kaiser Partner Financial Advisors AG, in Zollikon, CHE-114.836.181, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 207 vom 27.10.2014, Publ. 1788617).
Statutenänderung:
21.06.2016.
Sitz neu:
Zürich.
Domizil neu:
Glärnischstrasse 18, 8002 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Louw, Sandra Marie, neuseeländische Staatsangehörige, in Küsnacht ZH, Direktorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Voser, Melanie Andrea, von Niederglatt, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Wittwer, Melanie Andrea].
Publication number: 2913513, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Kaiser Partner (Schweiz) AG, in Zollikon, CHE-110.313.820, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 11.01.2016, Publ. 2586435).
Statutenänderung:
21.06.2016.
Sitz neu:
Zürich.
Domizil neu:
Glärnischstrasse 18, 8002 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Louw, Sandra Marie, neuseeländische Staatsangehörige, in Küsnacht ZH, Direktorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.