Jean-Pierre Kusio
domiciled in Le Landeron, from Meinisberg Active mandates: Fondation Art Vif Connected persons: Ali Incegöz, Yann Félix, Gaëlle Le Berre Antezana Cruz and more You can stay up to date through "Jean-Pierre Kusio", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jean-Pierre Kusio"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Jean-Pierre Kusio", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jean-Pierre Kusio"
|
Places where people with the name Jean-Pierre Kusio live
Sectors in which people with the name Jean-Pierre Kusio work
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Operation of nursing homes and inpatient facilities
Private persons with the name Jean-Pierre Kusio
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Jean-Pierre Kusio
Publication number: 4206609, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Fondation Art Vif, à Biel/Bienne, CHE-112.193.047, fondation (No. FOSC 39 du 26.02.2015, Publ. 2011363).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Héry-Cléry, Jeanne Joëlle, ressortissante française, à Cressier NE, membre, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Damiata-Scartazzini, Arianna, de Bregaglia, à Neuchâtel, directrice, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: de Bondo, à Voëns (Saint-Blaise)];
Kusio, Jean-Pierre, de Meinisberg, à Le Landeron, membre du conseil de fondation, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: à Evilard, membre, avec signature collective à deux].
Publication number: 3056027, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
ASQA Sàrl, à Evilard, CHE-113.194.865, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 170 du 02.09.2016, Publ. 3034261).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
ASQA Sàrl en liquidation.
Adresse de liquidation:
c/o Jean-Pierre Kusio, Résidence les Pêches, 2525 Le Landeron. La société est dissoute par décision de l'assemblée des associés du 07.09.2016.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Kusio, Jean-Pierre, de Meinisberg, à Le Landeron, associé et gérant, liquidateur, avec signature individuelle, pour une part sociale de CHF 20'000.00 [précédemment: associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: 3034261, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
ASQA Sàrl, à Evilard, CHE-113.194.865, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 212 du 03.11.2014, Publ. 1800905).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Kusio, Jean-Pierre, de Meinisberg, à Le Landeron, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour une part sociale de CHF 20'000.00 [précédemment: à Evilard].