Sven Kispalko
domiciled in Meilen, from Germany Active mandates: Living Seeds International AG, Genossenschaft Migros Zürich and more Connected persons: Jürg Kallay, Stefan Doeblin, Marcos David Kahle Armbruster and more You can stay up to date through "Sven Kispalko", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Sven Kispalko"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Sven Kispalko", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Sven Kispalko"
|
Places where people with the name Sven Kispalko live
Sectors in which people with the name Sven Kispalko work
Operation of other financial institutions
Trading with various goods
Sport services
Operation of restaurants
Operation of other financial institutions
Trading with various goods
Sport services
Operation of restaurants
Private persons with the name Sven Kispalko
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Sven Kispalko
Publication number: HR02-1006137334, Commercial Registry Office Zurich
Living Seeds International AG, in Zürich, CHE-358.347.741, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 22.05.2024, Publ. 1006036340).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gutberlet, Thomas Andreas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Dipperz (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kispalko, Sven, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Meilen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005290763, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Living Seeds International AG, in Hünenberg, CHE-358.347.741, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 09.07.2021, Publ. 1005245176).
Statutenänderung:
02.09.2021.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 207'766.99 [bisher: CHF 196'224.38].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 207'766.99 [bisher: CHF 196'224.38].
Aktien neu:
20'776'699 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 0.01 [bisher: 19'622'438 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 0.01]. Die Generalversammlung hat mit Beschluss vom 02.09.2021 eine genehmigte Kapitalerhöhung gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten eingeführt. Genehmigte Kapitalerhöhung. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sikura Revisionsgesellschaft AG (CHE-101.607.168), in Hünenberg, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gutberlet, Thomas Andreas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Dipperz (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kispalko, Sven, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Meilen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Copartner Revision AG (CHE-107.423.224), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004701986, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft Migros Zürich, in Zürich, CHE-105.970.604, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 78 vom 24.04.2017, S.0, Publ. 3481149).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Biland, Christian, von Birmenstorf (AG), in Wettingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Kispalko, Sven, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Meilen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hauser, Dominik, von Trasadingen, in Flurlingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Schaffhausen].