Pierre Jotterand
domiciled in Nyon, from Saint-Livres Active mandates: Cofis Gestion SA, Cofis SA and more Connected persons: Donato D'Oria, Alessandra de Picciotto Ertan, Donato D'Oria and more You can stay up to date through "Pierre Jotterand", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pierre Jotterand"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Pierre Jotterand", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pierre Jotterand"
|
Places where people with the name Pierre Jotterand live
Sectors in which people with the name Pierre Jotterand work
Fund management
Fiduciary services
Services for banks and credit institutions
Manufacturing of medical goods
Trading with various goods
Operation of other financial institutions
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of investment companies
Fund management
Fiduciary services
Services for banks and credit institutions
Manufacturing of medical goods
Trading with various goods
Operation of other financial institutions
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of investment companies
Private persons with the name Pierre Jotterand
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Pierre Jotterand
Publication number: 6139640, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Cofis Compagnia Fiduciaria SA, in Lugano, CH-514.3.004.932-3, società anonima (FUSC no. 198 del 13.10.2008, p. 14, Pubbl. 4687488).
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Jotterand, Pierre, da Saint-Livres, in Nyon, presidente, con firma collettiva a due;
Ertan, Murat, da Le Grand-Saconnex, in Chêne-Bougeries, membro, con firma collettiva a due.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Bertoni, Franco, da Lugano, in Montagnola (Collina d'Oro), amministratore unico, con firma individuale [finora:in Montagnola, membro con firma collettiva a due].
Publication number: 5777584, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Cofis Treuhand AG, in Zürich, CH-020.3.022.101-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 230 vom 26.11.2008, S. 26, Publ. 4750076).
Firma neu:
Cofis Treuhand AG in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 23.07.2010 aufgelöst.
Liquidationsadresse:
c/o Cofis SA, Place Chauderon 18, 1003 Lausanne.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Maurer, Mathias, von Schmiedrued, in Bassersdorf, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jotterand, Pierre, von Saint-Livres, in Nyon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ertan, Murat, von Le Gand-Saconnex, in Chêne-Bougeries, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cofis SA (CH-550.1.038.311-1), in Lausanne, Liquidatorin.
Publication number: 4619972, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Cofis Treuhand AG, in Zürich, CH-020.3.022.101-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 15.10.2007, S. 21, Publ. 4154666).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Raffoul, Azar, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Genf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jotterand, Pierre, von Saint-Livres, in Nyon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Calame, Gérald, von Reverolle und Locle,Le, in Renens VD, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Locle,Le, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Ertan, Murat, von Le Gand-Saconnex, in Chêne-Bougeries, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.