Peter John
domiciled in Hermagor, from Mels Active mandates: Spina Mels AG Connected persons: Josef Zimmermann, Sabina John Banz, Andreas John You can stay up to date through "Peter John", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter John"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Peter John", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter John"
|
|
Peter John
domiciled in Zollikerberg, from Mels Active mandates: Emporique GmbH Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Peter John", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter John"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Peter John", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter John"
|
|
Peter John
domiciled in Schluein, from Domat/Ems Active mandates: Bürocenter Ilanz AG Connected persons: No connected person You can stay up to date through "Peter John", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter John"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Peter John", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Peter John"
|
Places where people with the name Peter John live
Sectors in which people with the name Peter John work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Trading with various goods
Trading in IT and communications products
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Trading with various goods
Trading in IT and communications products
Private persons with the name Peter John
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Peter John
Publication number: HR01-1005702600, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Emporique GmbH, in Zollikon, CHE-214.803.495, Im Ahorn 18, 8125 Zollikerberg, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
28.02.2023. 09.03.2023.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Durchführung von Import- und Exportgeschäften mit Waren sowie die Organisation, Vermittlung und Durchführung von Urlaubsreisen. Sie bietet Dienstleistungen im Zusammenhang mit Import- und Exportgeschäften mit Waren und mit Urlaubsreisen an. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Anteilbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Gemäss Erklärung vom 28.02.2023 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
John, Peter, von Mels, in Zollikon, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR02-1005062811, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Koch & Gsell AG, in Steinach, CHE-422.513.089, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 111 vom 11.06.2020, Publ. 1004908424).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
John, Peter, von Mels, in Arbon, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Aegerter, Wera, von Zürich, in Rorschach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004763948, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Spina Mels AG, in Mels, CHE-112.486.058, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 236 vom 05.12.2017, S.0, Publ. 3910659).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
John-Ackermann, Elsbeth, von Mels und Mühlehorn, in Sierre, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
John, Peter, von Mels, in Hermagor (AT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Dolni Brezany (CZ)].