Gianne Lucia Holmgren
domiciled in Birrwil, from Sweden Active mandates: FRUYTS GmbH, Verein Label STEP - fair trade Teppiche Connected persons: Milija Kovacevic, Katharina Anna Frey Bossoni, Michael Baumann and more You can stay up to date through "Gianne Lucia Holmgren", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Gianne Lucia Holmgren"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Gianne Lucia Holmgren", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Gianne Lucia Holmgren"
|
Places where people with the name Gianne Lucia Holmgren live
Sectors in which people with the name Gianne Lucia Holmgren work
Trading with various goods
Religious, political or secular associations
Trading with various goods
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Gianne Lucia Holmgren
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Gianne Lucia Holmgren
Publication number: HR02-1005852831, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
FRUYTS GmbH, bisher in Baden, CHE-244.963.531, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 12.08.2022, Publ. 1005540228).
Statutenänderung:
13.04.2023.
Sitz neu:
Schlieren.
Domizil neu:
Industriestrasse 3, 8952 Schlieren.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Holmgren, Gianne, schwedische Staatsangehörige, in Birrwil, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Baden];
Kovacevic, Milija, von Wettingen, in Birrwil, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Baden].
Publication number: HR02-1005540228, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
FRUYTS GmbH, in Baden, CHE-244.963.531, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 247 vom 20.12.2021, Publ. 1005361806).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Holmgren, Gianne, schwedische Staatsangehörige, in Baden, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Kovacevic, Milija, von Wettingen, in Baden, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 4172655, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Verein Label STEP - fair trade Teppiche, in Bern, CHE-228.339.110, Verein (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 27.06.2016, Publ. 2913811).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Salzmann, Stefan, von Zürich, in Zürich, Sekretär, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Amrein, Christina Margaritha, von Rickenbach (LU), in Solothurn, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Holmgren, Gianne Lucia, schwedische Staatsangehörige, in Baden, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
da Rivaz Kahamaile, Marie Sophie Hélène, von Sion, in Genève, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.