Hanspeter Gresch
domiciled in Birmensdorf, from Zürich and Freienbach Active mandates: Betschon Treuhand AG, Dr. Kurt L. Meyer - Stiftung and more Connected persons: Kaj Lukas Schmid, Christian Schmid, Susanna Barbara Jenni and more You can stay up to date through "Hanspeter Gresch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Hanspeter Gresch"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Hanspeter Gresch", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Hanspeter Gresch"
|
Places where people with the name Hanspeter Gresch live
Sectors in which people with the name Hanspeter Gresch work
Fiduciary services
Other social services
Operation of investment companies
Fiduciary services
Other social services
Operation of investment companies
Private persons with the name Hanspeter Gresch
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Hanspeter Gresch
Publication number: HR02-1005899453, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
BTZ Holding AG, bisher in Cham, CHE-102.338.491, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 64 vom 01.04.2020, Publ. 1004863653).
Statutenänderung:
21.11.2023.
Sitz neu:
Birmensdorf (ZH).
Domizil neu:
c/o Hanspeter Gresch, Rütistrasse 4, 8903 Birmensdorf ZH.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmid, Christian, von Felsberg, in Oberglatt, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gresch, Hanspeter, von Zürich, in Birmensdorf (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gresch, Hans-Peter, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 1308087, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Betschon Treuhand AG, in Zürich, CHE-114.525.723, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 152 vom 10.08.2009, S. 26, Publ. 5187684).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gresch, Hanspeter, von Zürich und Freienbach, in Birmensdorf ZH, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Schmid, Christian, von Felsberg, in Oberglatt, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Neerach, ohne eingetragene Funktion mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 6803496, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Dr. Kurt L. Meyer - Stiftung, in Zug, CH-170.7.000.668-5, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 27.11.2009, S. 22, Publ. 5363798).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meyer, Dr. Kurt L., von Zug, in Zug, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kupper, Gregor, von Sempach, in Neuheim, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gresch, Hanspeter, von Zürich und Freienbach, in Birmensdorf ZH, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.