Urs Josef Grätzer
domiciled in Einsiedeln, from Einsiedeln Active mandates: Hugo Dubno AG, Mainstreet Immobilien AG and more Connected persons: Pirmin Schumacher, Alex Hofer, Raphael Lenherr and more You can stay up to date through "Urs Josef Grätzer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Josef Grätzer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Urs Josef Grätzer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Urs Josef Grätzer"
|
Places where people with the name Urs Josef Grätzer live
Sectors in which people with the name Urs Josef Grätzer work
Trading in food products
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Trading in food products
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Urs Josef Grätzer
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Urs Josef Grätzer
Publication number: HR02-1005733640, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Handels-Aktiengesellschaft St. Gallen, in St. Gallen, CHE-107.268.774, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 15.12.2022, Publ. 1005629435).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grätzer, Urs, von Einsiedeln, in Einsiedeln, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Brugg AG (Brugg)].
Publication number: HR02-1005048694, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Oldtimer Gastro AG, in Winterthur, CHE-499.847.881, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2017, S.0, Publ. 3647573).
Firma neu:
Oldtimer Gastro AG in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 03.12.2020 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grätzer, Urs, von Einsiedeln, in Einsiedeln, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004940578, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
ARWA IMMOBILIEN AG, in Baar, CHE-109.454.187, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 113 vom 15.06.2020, Publ. 1004910571).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grätzer, Urs, von Einsiedeln, in Brugg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Weber Gähwiler Revisions AG (CHE-101.933.998), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wanger, Walter, genannt Erwin, von Wädenswil, in Thalwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Wanger, Erwin, von Wädenswil, in Thalwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wanger, Ruth, von Wädenswil, in Thalwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gähwiler, Ruckstuhl Treuhand AG (CHE-107.907.864), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.