Lesya Gonçalves
domiciled in Crans-Montana, from Crans-Montana Active mandates: DPS INNOVATION SWITZERLAND SA, IQDEMY SA and more Connected persons: Vladislav Mirchev, Olga Kondratyeva, Vladislav Mirchev You can stay up to date through "Lesya Gonçalves", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lesya Gonçalves"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Lesya Gonçalves", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Lesya Gonçalves"
|
Places where people with the name Lesya Gonçalves live
Sectors in which people with the name Lesya Gonçalves work
Trading in IT and communications products
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Trading in IT and communications products
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Private persons with the name Lesya Gonçalves
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Lesya Gonçalves
Publication number: HR02-1005490855, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
IQDEMY BIOPRINTING SA, à Sierre, CHE-297.659.652, société anonyme (No. FOSC 170 du 02.09.2020, Publ. 1004970187).
Modification des statuts:
24.05.2022.
Nouvelle raison sociale:
FactorTrading SA.
Nouveau siège:
Sion.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o LEOLEX Sàrl, Rue du Pré-Fleuri 19c, 1950 Sion.
Nouveau but:
La société a pour but le commerce de matières premières, de produits agricoles, de produits chimiques ainsi que de produits alimentaires en Suisse et à l'étranger. En outre, elle a pour but l'acquisition, l'administration et la gestion de participations à toutes entreprises commerciales, financières, industrielles ou autres, en Suisse et à l'étranger.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Kondrateva, Olga, ressortissante russe, à Paphos (CY), présidente du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle;
Gonçalves, Lesya, de Crans-Montana, à Crans-Montana, administratrice, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Kudinov, Roman, de Ayent, à Ayent, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004970184, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
DPS INNOVATION SWITZERLAND SA, à Sierre, CHE-260.827.122, société anonyme (No. FOSC 108 du 08.06.2020, Publ. 1004905390).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Gonçalves, Lesya, de Crans-Montana, à Crans-Montana, administratrice, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004970187, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
IQDEMY BIOPRINTING SA, à Sierre, CHE-297.659.652, société anonyme (No. FOSC 107 du 05.06.2020, Publ. 1004904260).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Gonçalves, Lesya, de Crans-Montana, à Crans-Montana, administratrice, avec signature individuelle.