Dimo Jürg Gehrig
domiciled in Eschenbach, from Ammerswil Active mandates: Gamma Tauri AG Connected persons: Marc Jürg Gehrig, Franz Lurvink You can stay up to date through "Dimo Jürg Gehrig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dimo Jürg Gehrig"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dimo Jürg Gehrig", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dimo Jürg Gehrig"
|
Places where people with the name Dimo Jürg Gehrig live
Sectors in which people with the name Dimo Jürg Gehrig work
Services regarding management consulting
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Dimo Jürg Gehrig
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Dimo Jürg Gehrig
Publication number: HR02-1005638889, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
CO13, in Basel, CHE-110.565.304, Verein (SHAB Nr. 191 vom 03.10.2022, Publ. 1005573922).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gehrig, Dimo Jürg, von Ammerswil, in Eschenbach (LU), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005573922, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
CO13, in Basel, CHE-110.565.304, Verein (SHAB Nr. 3 vom 06.01.2021, Publ. 1005064569).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gehrig, Dimo Jürg, von Ammerswil, in Eschenbach (LU), Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 6767408, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
GEHRIG Business Services AG, in Basel, CH-270.3.005.259-4, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 215 vom 05.11.2008, S. 5, Publ. 4720546).
Statutenänderung:
09.07.2012.
Firma neu:
GEHRIG & HÖHENER Partner AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(GEHRIG & HÖHENER Partner SA) (GEHRIG & HÖHENER Partenaires SA) (GEHRIG & HÖHENER Partners Ltd.).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gehrig, Jürg, von Ammerswil, in Magden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gehrig, Dimo, von Ammerswil, in Eschenbach LU, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Höhener, Beat, von Gais und Wetzikon ZH, in Arlesheim, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.