Elisabeth Freuler
domiciled in Basel, from Glarus Active mandates: Culture of Change Foundation in Liquidation Connected persons: Daniel Wiener Freuler You can stay up to date through "Elisabeth Freuler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Elisabeth Freuler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Elisabeth Freuler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Elisabeth Freuler"
|
Places where people with the name Elisabeth Freuler live
Sectors in which people with the name Elisabeth Freuler work
Religious, political or secular associations
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Elisabeth Freuler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Elisabeth Freuler
Publication number: HR02-1005856857, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Culture of Change Foundation, in Basel, CHE-300.970.615, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 225 vom 18.11.2020, Publ. 1005025645).
Name neu:
Culture of Change Foundation in Liquidation. Die Stiftung ist gemäss Verfügung der BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht beider Basel (BSABB) vom 11.09.2023 aufgehoben.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wiener Freuler, Daniel, von Bern, in Basel, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Freuler, Elisabeth, von Glarus, in Basel, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004955569, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
ecos AG, in Basel, CHE-107.610.855, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 04.10.2017, Publ. 3788915).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wiener, Daniel, von Bern, in Basel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Freuler, Elisabeth, von Glarus, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Aellig, Patrik, von Basel, in Basel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Grossmann, Marco, von Rothenthurm, in Pratteln, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Basel, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-0004447547, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Stiftung ARTPORT Basel, in Basel, CHE-300.970.615, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 105 vom 04.06.2018, Publ. 4266545).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wiener Freuler, Daniel, von Bern, in Basel, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Freuler, Elisabeth, von Glarus, in Basel, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.