Robert Fink
domiciled in Winkel, from Winkel and Schaffhausen Active mandates: Hegner-Stiftung I Connected persons: Barbara Graf-Fink, Verena Fink-Abderhalden, Andreas Robert Fink and more You can stay up to date through "Robert Fink", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Robert Fink"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Robert Fink", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Robert Fink"
|
Places where people with the name Robert Fink live
Sectors in which people with the name Robert Fink work
Other social services
Other social services
Private persons with the name Robert Fink
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Robert Fink
Publication number: HR02-1005248482, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung "Hülfsgesellschaft Winterthur", in Winterthur, CHE-113.636.159, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 20.02.2020, Publ. 1004834567).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fink, Robert, von Winkel, in Winkel, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Thommen, Peter, von Oberdorf BL, in Seuzach, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-106.839.438), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Consultive Revisions AG (CHE-105.253.715), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004947459, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
FINVEST Immobilien AG, in Schwyz, CHE-338.679.252, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 18.04.2018, Publ. 4178581).
Statutenänderung:
23.07.2020.
Sitz neu:
Lauerz.
Domizil neu:
Niedermatt 8, 6424 Lauerz.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fink, Robert, von Heimiswil, in Lauerz, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004947458, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Fink Architekten AG, in Schwyz, CHE-106.892.941, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 42 vom 01.03.2013, S.0, Publ. 7085144).
Statutenänderung:
23.07.2020.
Firma neu:
Fink Architekten AG in Liquidation.
Sitz neu:
Lauerz.
Domizil neu:
Niedermatt 8, 6424 Lauerz.
Aktien neu:
300 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 300 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 23.07.2020 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fink, Robert, von Heimiswil, in Lauerz, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fink, Helga, von Sattel und Heimiswil, in Lauerz, Mitglied und Liquidatorin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].