Ursula Dörig Bischof
domiciled in Appenzell, from Appenzell and Eggersriet Active mandates: Garage Ralph Bischof AG, Bischof International Car Import AG Connected persons: Ralph Bischof, Ralph Bischof You can stay up to date through "Ursula Dörig Bischof", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Ursula Dörig Bischof"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Ursula Dörig Bischof", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Ursula Dörig Bischof"
|
Places where people with the name Ursula Dörig Bischof live
Sectors in which people with the name Ursula Dörig Bischof work
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Car dealership
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Car dealership
Private persons with the name Ursula Dörig Bischof
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Ursula Dörig Bischof
Publication number: 4096718, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Garage Lustmühle AG, in Teufen AR, CH-300.3.011.086-3, Betrieb einer Garage usw. Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 19.05.2005, S. 3, Publ. 2843654).
Statutenänderung:
30.08.2007.
Firma neu:
Garage Ralph Bischof AG.
Domizil neu:
Hauptstrasse 1445, 9062 Lustmühle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dörig Bischof, Ursula, von Appenzell und Eggersriet, in Appenzell, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift (nicht: Bischof, Ursula).
Publication number: 3282248, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Personalfürsorgestiftung der Firma Garage Lustmühle AG, in Teufen AR, CH-300.7.011.033-6, Fürsorge für die Arbeitnehmer usw. Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 173 vom 07.09.2005, S. 3, Publ. 3006624).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ittensohn, Werner, von St. Margrethen, in Wittenbach, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kuchowsky, Myrtra, von Kreuzlingen, in Engelburg (Gaiserwald), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Dörig Bischof, Ursula, von Appenzell und Eggersriet, in Appenzell, Vizepräsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2843654, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
Garage Lustmühle AG, in Teufen AR, CH-300.3.011.086-3, Betrieb einer Garage usw. Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 50 vom 13.03.2002, S. 2, Publ. 381488).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Christen-Willi, Susanne, von Wolfenschiessen, in St. Gallen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Willi-Baltis, Jean, von Gais, in St. Gallen, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Gueng, Christoph, von Basel, in Teufen AR, mit Einzelprokura.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bischof, Ralph, von Eggersriet, in Appenzell, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Bischof, Ursula, von Appenzell und Eggersriet, in Appenzell, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.