Pierre De Preux
domiciled in Veyras, from Sierre Active mandates: Fondation Interpol pour un monde plus sûr, en liquidation Connected persons: Elias Murr, Georges Zecchin, Serge Telle and more You can stay up to date through "Pierre De Preux", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pierre De Preux"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Pierre De Preux", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Pierre De Preux"
|
Places where people with the name Pierre De Preux live
Sectors in which people with the name Pierre De Preux work
Religious, political or secular associations
Religious, political or secular associations
Private persons with the name Pierre De Preux
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Pierre De Preux
Publication number: 3349909, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Fardafin Holding SA, in Lugano, CHE-101.471.561, società anonima (FUSC no. 233 del 01.12.2015, Pubbl. 2512185).
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
de Preux, Pierre, da Sierre, in Ginevra, vice-presidente, con firma collettiva a due.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Giacomini-Castelnuovo, Alessia, da Collina d'Oro, in Cademario, membro, con firma collettiva a due.
Publication number: 2489109, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
PNM Gestion SA, à Venthône, CHE-107.747.684, société anonyme (No. FOSC 91 du 13.05.2015, Publ. 2151587).
Nouvelle raison sociale:
PNM Gestion SA en liquidation.
Adresse de liquidation:
Rue Michel-Chauvet 11, 1208 Genève. La société est dissoute par décision de l'assemblée générale du 11.11.2015.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
de Preux, Christian, de Venthône, à Valence (ES), président et liquidateur, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président avec signature individuelle];
de Preux, Pierre-Alain, de Venthône, à Genève, administrateur et liquidateur, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: administrateur avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: 2151587, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
PNM Gestion SA, à Venthône, CHE-107.747.684, société anonyme (No. FOSC 181 du 19.09.2011, Publ. 6339894).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
de Preux, Jean, de Venthône, à Genève, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
de Preux, Christian, de Venthône, à Valence (ES), président, avec signature individuelle;
de Preux, Pierre-Alain, de Venthône, à Genève, administrateur, avec signature individuelle.