Christian Daumüller
domiciled in Thierachern, from Grenchen Active mandates: immo-daz GmbH Connected persons: Alexandra Daumüller-Ryser You can stay up to date through "Christian Daumüller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Daumüller"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Christian Daumüller", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Christian Daumüller"
|
Places where people with the name Christian Daumüller live
Sectors in which people with the name Christian Daumüller work
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Private persons with the name Christian Daumüller
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Christian Daumüller
Publication number: 936835, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Lagras Schaad AG, in Lommiswil, CH-241.3.006.726-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 13.04.2010, S. 17, Publ. 5584278).
Statutenänderung:
28.05.2013. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]. Mit Erklärung vom 28.05.2013 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
lemag treuhand & partner ag, in Solothurn, Revisionsstelle;
Daumüller, Christian, von Grenchen, in Bettlach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schaad, Markus Felix, von Lommiswil, in Grenchen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Schaad, Margrit, von Lommiswil, in Bettlach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 5584278, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Lagras Schaad AG, in Lommiswil, CH-241.3.006.726-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 215 vom 05.11.2009, S. 17, Publ. 5328338).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schaad, Robert, von Lommiswil, in Grenchen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Daumüller, Christian, von Grenchen, in Bettlach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates].
Publication number: 5328338, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Lagras Schaad AG, in Lommiswil, CH-241.3.006.726-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 121 vom 26.06.2007, S. 13, Publ. 3993890).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Daumüller, Christian, von Grenchen, in Bettlach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.