Jean-Maurice Cailler
domiciled in Conthey, from Vevey Active mandates: SWISS RISK & CARE HOLDING SA, Gencare SA and more Connected persons: David Cochet, Yvan Roux, Stéphane Buff and more You can stay up to date through "Jean-Maurice Cailler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jean-Maurice Cailler"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Jean-Maurice Cailler", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Jean-Maurice Cailler"
|
Places where people with the name Jean-Maurice Cailler live
Sectors in which people with the name Jean-Maurice Cailler work
Operation of other financial institutions
Services for insurance and pensions
Leasing of intangible assets
IT services
Other social services
Trading in IT and communications products
Data processing and hosting services
Operation of investment companies
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Operation of other financial institutions
Services for insurance and pensions
Leasing of intangible assets
IT services
Other social services
Trading in IT and communications products
Data processing and hosting services
Operation of investment companies
Operation of general healthcare facilities
Private persons with the name Jean-Maurice Cailler
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Jean-Maurice Cailler
Publication number: HR02-1006010493, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Qualibroker Oberwallis AG, in Visp, CHE-418.478.030, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 26.09.2023, Publ. 1005846133). [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung vom 10.02.2016 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Britsch, Beat, von Termen, in Zwischbergen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Cailler, Jean-Maurice, von Vevey, in Conthey, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA (CHE-105.760.685), in Martigny, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005850612, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Sulser & Partner AG, in Zürich, CHE-266.432.785, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 19 vom 27.01.2022, Publ. 1005390786).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Niedermann, Manuel, von Uzwil, in Münchwilen (TG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Spiess-Bolliger, Tina, von Hombrechtikon, in Wettswil am Albis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Cailler, Jean-Maurice, von Vevey, in Conthey, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sulser, Madeleine, von Domat/Ems, in Thundorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Thalmann, Urs, von Root, in Aarau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005846174, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Pharmacies du Haut-Plateau SA, à Lens, CHE-101.450.139, société anonyme (No. FOSC 117 du 20.06.2023, Publ. 1005773385).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Cailler, Jean-Maurice, de Vevey, à Conthey, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux avec Mario Magada, Mario Tanzi, Serge Marmy, Thibault Heinzer, ou Frank Roger.