Fabien Nicolas Bouduban
domiciled in Roches, from Val Terbi Active mandates: Vardeco SA, Caland SA and more Connected persons: Marjolaine Laurie Herbert Cordier, Marc Philippe Chapatte, Fabrice Schmitlin and more You can stay up to date through "Fabien Nicolas Bouduban", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Fabien Nicolas Bouduban"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Fabien Nicolas Bouduban", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Fabien Nicolas Bouduban"
|
Places where people with the name Fabien Nicolas Bouduban live
Sectors in which people with the name Fabien Nicolas Bouduban work
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of libraries and museums
Architectural and engineering activities
Leasing of intangible assets
Sport services
Trading with various goods
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Operation of libraries and museums
Architectural and engineering activities
Leasing of intangible assets
Sport services
Trading with various goods
Private persons with the name Fabien Nicolas Bouduban
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Fabien Nicolas Bouduban
Publication number: HR02-1005700461, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Vardeco SA, à Develier, CHE-103.707.786, société anonyme (No. FOSC 191 du 01.10.2020, Publ. 1004990734).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bouduban, Fabien Nicolas, de Val Terbi, à Roches BE, directeur général, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005366362, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Caland SA, à Delémont, CHE-267.526.609, société anonyme (No. FOSC 125 du 01.07.2021, Publ. 1005236472).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Verniol, Michel Christian Josselyn, ressortissant français, à Delémont, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bouduban, Fabien Nicolas, de Val Terbi, à Roches BE, administrateur, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: HR02-1005172497, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Caland SA, à Boncourt, CHE-267.526.609, société anonyme (No. FOSC 61 du 29.03.2021, Publ. 1005136633).
Modification des statuts:
30.04.2021.
Nouveau siège:
Delémont.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue Saint-Randoald 36, 2800 Delémont.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Billig, François Xavier Gérard, ressortissant français, à Delémont, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bouduban, Fabien Nicolas, de Val Terbi, à Roches BE, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à Belprahon];
Verniol, Michel Christian Josselyn, ressortissant français, à Delémont, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.