Dieter Stefan Bernhardt
domiciled in Liestal, from Bülach Active mandates: Regio Personal AG, DINOVA HOLDING AG and more Connected persons: Martin Lehner-Schenker, Vanessa Limani, Guido Frey and more You can stay up to date through "Dieter Stefan Bernhardt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dieter Stefan Bernhardt"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Dieter Stefan Bernhardt", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Dieter Stefan Bernhardt"
|
Places where people with the name Dieter Stefan Bernhardt live
Sectors in which people with the name Dieter Stefan Bernhardt work
Temp agency services
Operation of other financial institutions
Architectural and engineering activities
Services regarding management consulting
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Manufacturing of household appliances
Other construction
IT services
Temp agency services
Operation of other financial institutions
Architectural and engineering activities
Services regarding management consulting
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Manufacturing of household appliances
Other construction
IT services
Private persons with the name Dieter Stefan Bernhardt
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Dieter Stefan Bernhardt
Publication number: HR02-1005862462, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Berger AG Augst, in Augst, CHE-107.791.403, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 82 vom 29.04.2020, Publ. 1004879571).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bernhardt, Dieter, von Bülach, in Liestal, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schäublin, Tobias, von Bennwil, in Oberdorf (BL), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005354389, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
ZM Advisory AG, in Risch, CHE-314.248.878, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 247 vom 20.12.2018, Publ. 1004526206).
Firma neu:
ZM Advisory AG in Liquidation.
Aktien neu:
10'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 10.00 [bisher: 10'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 10.00].
Vinkulierung neu:
Die statutarische Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist von Gesetzes wegen aufgehoben. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 23.11.2021 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schnorf, Rudolf Werner, von Meilen, in Meilen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ziegler, Andreas Victor, von Solothurn, in Meilen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bernhardt, Dieter Stefan, von Bülach, in Liestal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
finaplus GmbH (CHE-109.824.806), in Liestal, Liquidatorin.
Publication number: HR02-1004868411, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
SATHOM SARL, in Waldenburg, CHE-219.731.963, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 166 vom 29.08.2019, Publ. 1004705212).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bernhardt, Dieter, von Bülach, in Liestal, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.